Trustees WOMEN@THEWELL

Charity number: 1118613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Louise Daughton Chair 01 August 2023
None on record
Eleanor Anne Casey Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Hannah Coban Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Rebecca Branch Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Sarah Cecelia Tariro Galloway Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
Sr Susan Browne Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
Dr Anna Frances Rowlands Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
FIONA JANE DICK Trustee 18 September 2017
ARCAID
Received: On time
NBCW CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time