Trustees RED SQUIRREL SURVIVAL TRUST
Charity number: 1116947

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES WILLIAM HARLEY HAY EARL OF KINNOULL | Chair | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Venetia Leng | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Trotter | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Pring | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Schroder | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLISS | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIR BERTIE ROSS | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILES HERCHARD MOUNSEY-HEYSHAM | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
THE HON GEORGE EDWARD LOPES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.