VILLAGE BY VILLAGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small charity, making a big difference. A highly cost-effective, UK-based charity working in African villages to reduce needless suffering of children in poverty by working directly with beneficiaries living in impoverished rural communities in Ghana, West Africa. Village by Village builds rural schools, provides practical sanitation measures, awards child scholarships and digs wells.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- Togo
Governance
- 23 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NICHOLAS PETER SWIFT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lawrencia Awuku | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Holt | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Little | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul King | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Sheremey | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BROOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.88k | £153.00k | £101.47k | £123.00k | £123.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.72k | £116.29k | £129.90k | £133.43k | £125.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/10/06
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE PERSONS, WHETHER OR NOT THEY RESIDENT OR TEMPORARILY LOCATED IN GHANA, BUT IN PARTICULAR CITIZENS OF GHANA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL , GEOGRAPHICAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION AND CIRCUMSTANCES 3.2 TO WORK WHERE APPROPRIATE WITH OTHER ASSOCIATED AND RELATED ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL, OVERSEAS, GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Lyndhurst Avenue
SALE
Cheshire
M33 5BF
- Phone:
- 07887870090
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window