CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CABA provides lifelong support to past and present ICAEW members and their families in the UK and across the globe. Our services are free, impartial and strictly confidential. From a listening ear in troubled times, through personal and professional development, to carer support and financial assistance, our commitment is simple: to be with you and your family, for life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,569,335
Donations and legacies | £485.90k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £2.17k | |
Investments | £4.08m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,598,286
Raising funds | £50.01k | |
Charitable activities | £5.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£7,972,069 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.55m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.01k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.55m | |
Retained for future use | £6.94m |
People

46 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Canada
- Cyprus
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Malta
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 28 June 2011: Standard registration
- CABA (Working name)
- CABA (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH COPPOCK | Chair | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew George Wauchope | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sahil Bhardwaj | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rupert James Terry | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Julia Davis | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Jane Gale | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Anokhee Davda | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Lakhbir Singh Mann | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Isabel Ramos De Noronha Divana | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Roger Leonard Merchant | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Tobias James Newsome Bushill | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Angela Michelle Catlin | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Fay Ashwell | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Phillipa Jane Seagers | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Colin Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14m | £4.74m | £3.80m | £4.71m | £4.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80m | £6.64m | £5.88m | £5.09m | £5.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £186.83k | £1.31m | £115.08k | £670.38k | £485.90k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.17k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.31k | £15.09k | £22.68k | £12.05k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.93m | £3.41m | £3.66m | £4.02m | £4.08m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.10k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £33.45k | £1.02m | £0 | £533.49k | £364.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.52m | £6.39m | £5.79m | £5.04m | £5.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £238.59k | £236.18k | £92.55k | £41.27k | £50.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £82.70k | £34.11k | £51.41k | £58.68k | £57.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £238.59k | £218.21k | £78.70k | £25.08k | £37.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £35.76k | £10.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.32m | £1.57m | £1.70m | £1.62m | £1.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | £124.14m | £124.94m | £142.79m | £131.35m | £139.28m | |
|
Other assets | £7.08m | £7.26m | £6.25m | £4.18m | £2.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.04m | £808.33k | £942.06k | £901.24k | £833.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2013 as amended on 14 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE BENEFICIARIES; 2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Linked charities
- CASPAR AND SIDNEY VAN DE LINDE FUND
- ELKANNAH MACKINTOSH SHARP FUND
- GENERAL FUND HELD ICW THE CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
- GEORGE WALTER KNOX
- H F HOLLOWAY MEMORIAL FUND
- JOHN AVERY
- JOHN GEORGE GRIFFITHS
- SPECIAL FUND
- SPECIAL FUND HELD ICW THE CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
- THE CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
- THOMAS SOUTHCOTT
- WILLIAM BARCLAY PEAT MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND IN CONNECTION WITH THE INSTITUTE OF CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
- 28 June 2011 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chartered Accountants'
Benevolent Association
Merrett House
Swift Park
Old Leicester Road
RUGBY
- Phone:
- 01788556366
- Email:
- enquiries@caba.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window