Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE GOSPORT

Charity number: 1116994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £248.60k £377.01k £298.56k £355.82k £344.15k
Total expenditure £248.55k £308.17k £360.19k £347.01k £355.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £155.98k £181.81k £110.30k £112.51k £184.19k