HUBY AND SUTTON-ON-THE-FOREST AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, advance and improve for the benefit of the public, agricultural, horticultural, forestry and rural crafts and skills in all their branches by the improvement of livestock and the demonstration of livestock, machinery, crafts, products, methods and processes connected with agriculture and agricultural education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET BRACEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM SINGLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.78k | £39 | £378 | £29.43k | £38.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.39k | £2.08k | £1.59k | £34.85k | £37.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 March 2025 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 August 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 August 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 August 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/06
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE AND IMPROVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL, FORESTRY AND RURAL CRAFTS AND SKILLS IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK , MACHINERY, CRAFTS, PRODUCTS, METHODS AND PROCESSES CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTURE AND AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONG ACRE
MAIN STREET
HUBY
YORK
YO61 1HS
- Phone:
- 01347810655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window