FRIENDS OF BROWICK ROAD PRIMARY AND NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to benefit Browick Road Primary and Nursery School, through events such as Fairs and Quiz Nights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 November 2006: Standard registration
- 12 September 2017: Funds received from 1031641 BUSY BEES PLAY GROUP
- FRIENDS OF BROWICK ROAD INFANT SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Magdalene Alexandra Divek Edwards | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Rutland | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Gilmore | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Laflin | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ann Burwood | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Walker | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £2.99k | £7.48k | £8.95k | £12.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.89k | £6.50k | £2.46k | £10.10k | £11.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/06 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2018 as amended on 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL INCLUDING THE NURSERY
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Browick Road Primary School
8-10 Browick Road
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0QW
- Phone:
- 01953 603061
- Email:
- browickfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window