NORTH LONDON M E NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a self-help group for people with M.E / CFS. It provides a forum for the sharing of information and experiences for its members and acts as a social forum as well. Activities include an quarterly newsletter, classes for therapies known to help people with ME / CFS, access to information and advice on benefits, information on medical, political and social developments related to ME
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Camden
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 08 February 2007: Standard registration
- 17 August 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £645 | £415 | £263 | £215 | £89 | |
|
Total expenditure | £173 | £261 | £97 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING DATED 17 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
A) TO HELP PEOPLE WHO ARE AFFECTED BY MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS (ME), ALSO KNOWN AS CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME (CFS), BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DECIDE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ME/CFS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window