Accounts and annual returns SLOUGH ISLAMIC SCHOOL PROJECT

Charity number: 1119531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 14 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 March 2024 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 March 2024 228 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 April 2022 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 08 April 2022 252 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 April 2022 617 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 April 2022 617 days late Download Open in new window