NATURA INTERNATIONAL LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Natura International contributes to conserving, protecting and promoting the natural ecosystems across Europe to support the economic, cultural and social prosperity of local communities. We are currently working with partners in the UK, Holland, Denmark, Poland, Lithuania and Ukraine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
Governance
- 19 January 2007: Standard registration
- 08 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420 | £2.90k | £16.61k | £18.77k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54k | £2.72k | £15.53k | £20.76k | £3.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 25 February 2016 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
NATURAL INTERNATIONAL CONSERVES, PROTECTS AND PROMOTES THE RICHNESS AND INTEGRITY OF NATURAL ECOSYSTEMS IN EUROPE. THROUGH OUR PROGRAMMES AND PARTNERSHIPS IN EUROPE WE: AA WE UNDERTAKE PRACTICAL CONSERVATION INITIATIVES BY APPLYING INNOVATIVE AND SOUND SOLUTIONS TO SUSTAIN THE RICHNESS AND INTEGRITY OF HABITATS AND SPECIES; B WE EDUCATE AND INVOLVE PEOPLE IN CONSERVATION TO FOSTER THEIR SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND A DESIRE TO TAKE PART IN PRESERVING IT; C WE CONDUCT HIGH QUALITY APPLIED ECOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND SURVEYS TO SHARE AND INCREASE KNOWLEDGE ABOUT NATURE CONSERVATION.HARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window