MIND AND BODY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving access to complimentary therapies, especially hypnotherapy, to people on low incomes living with trauma, life threatening illness or mental ill health and advancing the education of the beneficial effects of such therapies through research and other educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 March 2007: Standard registration
- 09 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237 | £58 | £29 | £2.98k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £12.52k | £8.44k | £10.96k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 28 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 09 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 03 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 14 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS: TO IMPROVE ACCESS TO COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES IN PARTICULAR HYPNOTHERAPY TO PEOPLE ON LOW INCOMES LIVING WITH TRAUMA, LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES OR MENTAL ILL HEALTH WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE ACCESS TO SUCH THERAPIES FOR REASONS OF COST OR LOCAL AVAILABILITY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE WIDER MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE WISER PUBLIC WITH RESPECT TO THE BENEFICIAL EFFECTS OF THESE THERAPIES THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN RESEARCH AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window