BOLTON INTERFAITH COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Faith Trails, Open Forum, Young Ambassadors, Dialogue with faith groups, Participation in Community Cohesion projects relating to faith and belief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
Governance
- 22 January 2007: Standard registration
- BOLTON INTERFAITH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOULANA FARUK ALI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shashikant Merchant | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.79k | £14.68k | £500 | £4.13k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.28k | £4.55k | £7.75k | £8.82k | £2.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.20k | £14.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: ADVANCING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHINGS TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE DIFFERENT FAITH COMMUNITIES IN THE BOLTON METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL AREA INCLUDING AN AWARENESS BOTH OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS.
Area of benefit
BOLTON METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 TIMBERBOTTOM
BOLTON
BL2 3DL
- Phone:
- 07713433210
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
boltoninterfaithcouncil.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window