THE ALLIANCE CHURCH SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith throughout the UK, whenever attainable in all parts of the world, by needs of focusing on the provisions of human and financial resources, in accordance with the objects and doctrinal statement found in the Memorandum of Association of the CACU UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 2006: Standard registration
- 02 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £15 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 18 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE U.K., WHENEVER ATTAINABLE IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD, BY MEANS OF FOCUSING ON THE PROVISIONS OF HUMAN AND FINANCIAL RESOURCES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS AND THE DOCTRINAL STATEMENT FOUND IN THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION OF THE CHINESE ALLIANCE CHURCHES UNION (UK)
Area of benefit
UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window