KIN (KIBERA IN NEED)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KIN (Kibera in Need) works to alleviate poverty particularly amongst orphaned and vulnerable children in the Kibera slum, Nairobi, Kenya. The charity works with Riziki, a Kenyan NGO and runs a number of projects including a Guardianship scheme supporting children with food, education, vaccinations and emergency needs, a Feeding Programme, an Education Scheme and a Business Support Scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
Governance
- 23 January 2007: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.74k | £214.73k | £133.74k | £87.16k | £110.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.21k | £178.15k | £194.52k | £188.38k | £123.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ILL EFFECTS OF POVERTY IN KIBERA, OR SUCH OTHER WIDER AREA IN KENYA AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT THEREBY LIMITING THE WIDER SCOPE OF THIS CLAUSE) THE SPECIFIC OBJECTS CONTAINED IN SUB CLAUSES (I) TO (III) INCLUSIVE HEREOF: I) TO THE PROVISION OF A GUARDIANSHIP SPONSORSHIP SCHEME TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE SUSTENANCE, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND MEDICAL CARE OF ORPHANED AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN; (II) TO THE PROVISION OF WELFARE AND HEALTH SERVICES TO INCLUDE THE SUPPORT OF LOCAL GROUPS DISSEMINATING HELP AND INFORMATION TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR AT RISK FROM THE DISEASE AUTO IMMUNE DEFICIENCY (HIV/AIDS); (III) TO THE PROVISION OF ECONOMICALLY BASED WORK RELATED LOANS OR GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT AND/OR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL BUSINESSES WHICH ARE PROVIDING OR INTENDED TO PROVIDE LOCAL AREA ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND INCOMES FOR THE PROPRIETORS AND/OR EMPLOYEES OF SUCH BUSINESSES.
Area of benefit
KIBERA, NAIROBI, KENYA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window