THE JET FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jet Foundation aims to raise funds to help children in financial hardship, with education, in sickness and the preservation of health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 February 2007: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03k | £100 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £692 | £372 | £137 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 22 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 08 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 DECEMBER 2006, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 6 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR F0AMILIES/CARERS WITH SUCH GOODS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR SERVICES OR FACILITIES. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OVERALL REMIT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window