THE RUFFORD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING GRANTS TO CONSERVATIONISTS AND ORGANISATIONS, PREDOMINANTLY IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£4,197,854
Donations and legacies | £307.55k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.87m | |
Other | £24.65k |
Total expenditure:
£3,759,636
Raising funds | £329.38k | |
Charitable activities | £3.43m | |
Other | £0 |
-£561,143 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £329.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.43m | |
Retained for future use | £438.22k |
People

5 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Albania
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Cape Verde
- Chile
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mauritania
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- São Tomé And Principe
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Uruguay
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 December 2006: Standard registration
- 28 March 2013: Funds received from 326163 THE RUFFORD FOUNDATION
- RUFFORD SMALL GRANTS (Working name)
- RUFFORD SMALL GRANTS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Broad | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR IAIN SMAILES | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HUGO BENJAMIN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Sarah Brunwin | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67m | £3.32m | £4.53m | £3.63m | £4.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89m | £4.07m | £3.63m | £3.77m | £3.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £24.45k | £14.59k | £307.55k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.67m | £3.32m | £4.50m | £3.62m | £3.87m | |
|
Income - Other | £2.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £24.65k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £307.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.58m | £3.76m | £3.30m | £3.45m | £3.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £311.25k | £312.06k | £332.98k | £319.83k | £329.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £57.92k | £58.20k | £68.26k | £81.08k | £104.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.90m | £3.14m | £2.55m | £2.87m | £2.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £311.25k | £312.06k | £332.98k | £319.83k | £329.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £516.03k | £500.49k | £487.47k | £476.73k | £462.55k | |
|
Long-term investments | £99.64m | £112.55m | £121.30m | £116.86m | £119.09m | |
|
Other assets | £950.03k | £745.99k | £996.51k | £606.57k | £1.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £141.38k | £437.50k | £289.93k | £273.96k | £280.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY TRUSTEES' RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 282 OF CHARITIES ACT 2011 AND CONCURRED WITH ON 17/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2013 as amended on 08 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO: 1. PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PREDOMINANTLY IN COUNTRIES OTHER THAN THOSE DENOTED BY THE INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND AS "ADVANCED ECONOMIES" THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF FAUNA AND FLORA AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 2. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF FAUNA AND FLORA AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING RESEARCH INTO THE SAME AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
COUNTRIES OTHER THAN THOSE DENOTED BY THE INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND AS "ADVANCED ECONOMIES"
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RUFFORD FOUNDATION
6TH FLOOR
250 TOTTENHAM COURT ROAD
LONDON
W1T 7QZ
- Phone:
- 02074368604
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window