HOLMWOOD/MORLAND HEALTHCARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN PROVISION OF FACILITIES,SUPPORT,EQUIPMENT AND EDUCATION FOR THE PATIENTS OF THE HOLMWOOD AND MORLAND SURGERIES IN TADLEY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 15 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DAVID ROBERT NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENNETH ALBERT JOHN HEFFERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STEPHEN JOHN COLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £2.73k | £150 | £1.22k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £153 | £2 | £4.52k | £12 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE HOLMWOOD SURGERY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BERKSHIRE AND HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLMWOOD HEALTH CENTRE
FRANKLIN AVENUE
TADLEY
RG26 4ER
- Phone:
- 01189814166
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window