AVIATION WITHOUT BORDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing humanitarian assistance through aviation services: air cargo shipments of medical and other supplies for and with other charities; aviation discovery days for disabled or disadvantaged children in UK; escorting of sick children to UK for medical treatment; plans to support our Dutch sister organisation (LZG) in operating a small light aircraft for humanitarian missions in East Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 December 2006: Standard registration
- AVIATION SANS FRONTIERES (ASF-UK) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Junaid Moolimani | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amina Waheed | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hawi | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James FInucane | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Dwarika | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.19k | £14.23k | £5.29k | £22.48k | £12.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.42k | £10.70k | £10.36k | £17.55k | £13.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 9 DECEMBER 2006, 12 JULY 2007 AND 12 MAY 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AND MEDICAL ASSISTANCE AND AIRBORNE TRANSPORT.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aviation Without Borders (AWB)
2 Whitsome Road
Derby
- Phone:
- 07459864961
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window