Financial history CLAPHAM POTTERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1129048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £84.22k £68.76k £84.56k £111.14k £132.09k
Total expenditure £85.51k £48.92k £90.20k £108.74k £122.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A