CLAPHAM POTTERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clapham Pottery is a not-for-profit community pottery providing classes and workshops for those who can afford to pay, as in evening classes, after-school classes and family workshops and also for the broader community many of whom can't afford to pay, e.g. the elderly, young carers, children from low-income families, the visually-impaired and adults with compound needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 07 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYDIA LATHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sara Zimmerman | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Fernandes | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrijn Van den Brande | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Gordon Dickey | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARKA COWLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELE RITA REILLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TOM CRAME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAOMI PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.22k | £68.76k | £84.56k | £111.14k | £132.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.51k | £48.92k | £90.20k | £108.74k | £122.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CERAMICS 2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LAMBETH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A RECTORY GROVE
LONDON
SW4 0DZ
- Phone:
- 02076220681
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window