CHILDREN OF SEED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Relief of financial hardship of Children of SEED, a school in Tamil Nadu, India for orphans and very poor children. 2. Their advancement of education. 3. Financing in part of equipmen and vocational training of Children of SEED (electrical, mechanical, motor-repair, welding, metal-bending, dressmaking)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 14 March 2007: Standard registration
- 13 May 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.92k | £6.18k | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | £11.88k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 22 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 17 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 20 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 08 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE CHILDREN OF SEED 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE CHILDREN OF SEED 3 THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING FOR FORMER CHILDREN OF SEED CHILDREN OF SEED IN THIS DOCUMENT REFERS TO ANY CHILDREN WHO FROM TIME TO TIME ARE CONNECTED TO ANY SCHOOL ORPHANAGE OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT RUN BY THE SOCIETY FOR EDUCATIONAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT IN INDIA
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window