BLUE TEXEL SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To register and maintain the purity of the Blue Texel Sheep Breed and promote the breed to the sheep farmers. The charity is also involved in the promotion of the agricultural sheep industry to the general purpose as part of the National Sheep Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 February 2007: Standard registration
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 March 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Joseph Davies | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Cormack | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather McCurdle | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mawer | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Hartley | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Thomas Stephenson | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gargett | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Emma Coles | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Karl Holmberg | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Clifford Jewitt | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BISHOP | Trustee | 03 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.40k | £111.17k | £109.99k | £140.92k | £156.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.29k | £78.99k | £87.86k | £156.87k | £128.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2023 | 372 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2023 | 372 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 January 2022 | 445 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 January 2022 | 445 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE BY ENCOURAGING AND IMPROVING BLUE TEXEL SHEEP (HEREAFTER CALLED "BLUE TEXELS") BY BREEDING, PROMOTION AND MANAGEMENT, AND BY ENCOURAGING THEIR USE, APPRECIATION, WELL-BEING AND PROTECTION IN THE UK. (BLUE TEXELS INCLUDE SHEEP KNOWN AS "BLAUWE TEXELAARS" IN THEIR COUNTRY OF ORIGIN OR ELSEWHERE)
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLME HOUSE
THE DALE
AINSTABLE
CARLISLE
CA4 9RH
- Phone:
- 01768870523
- Email:
- office@bluetexelsheep.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window