Financial history FLY NAVY HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1117272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £814.75k £742.27k £8.52m £3.09m £2.74m
Total expenditure £979.90k £882.88k £2.08m £2.57m £2.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £268.79k £277.82k £3.58m £260.46k £335.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £442.79k £519.98k £7.15m £2.43m £2.19m
Income - Other trading activities £371.84k £189.57k £1.37m £651.81k £521.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.46k £179 £2.66k £29.11k
Income - Other £120 £31.27k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £103.00k £369.81k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.35k £639.32k £1.21m £1.56m £1.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £233.55k £243.57k £862.71k £1.01m £754.53k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £14.23k £50.69k £60.30k £65.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £20.92k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0