Financial history POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK HACKNEY CHURCH

Charity number: 1117205
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £30.17k £44.28k £82.21k £85.36k £93.62k
Total expenditure £27.74k £43.78k £79.02k £89.51k £95.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A