INTERNATIONAL YOUTH HOSTEL FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Tourism, Outdoor Education and Recreation and Environmental Conservation. On behalf of its parent charity, the International Youth Hostel Federation (IYHF), provides International Marketing and Information Technology Support to all member National Youth Hostel Associations, a global Online Booking Service @ www.hihostels.com, monitors Hostel Standards and offers International Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£633,149
Donations and legacies | £1.29k | |
Charitable activities | £598.58k | |
Other trading activities | £2.38k | |
Investments | £30.90k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£631,807
Raising funds | £8.79k | |
Charitable activities | £623.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£58,720 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £623.02k | |
Retained for future use | £1.34k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £623.02k | |
Retained for future use | £60.06k |
People

11 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Algeria
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kuwait
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Luxembourg
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovenia
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sudan
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tunisia
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
- HOSTELLING INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- HOSTELLING INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom De Bruyckere | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Marie Sandoval | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Miguel Perestrello | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Hussain Ali Alhababi | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Abdusalam El Elarabi Abuehmaera | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sanni Helena Viirto | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Uwe Boehm | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Alan Bourne | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephan Kurmann | Trustee | 03 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69m | £1.14m | £744.10k | £1.58m | £633.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89m | £1.54m | £782.11k | £629.15k | £631.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £253.53k | £24.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £101.55k | £27.42k | £14.23k | £6.24k | £1.29k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.88k | £1.09k | £720 | £4.38k | £2.38k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.10m | £695.43k | £615.99k | £598.58k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £58.67k | £15.18k | £8.97k | £10.58k | £30.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £24.75k | £941.44k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.88m | £1.54m | £778.37k | £624.92k | £623.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.60k | £2.48k | £3.73k | £4.23k | £8.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.41k | £5.76k | £465 | £20.34k | £12.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £32.28k | £16.23k | £2.20k | £463 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.98k | £1.94k | £3.40k | £2.21k | £7.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £31.81k | £26.32k | £20.18k | £40.82k | £21.44k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.45m | £427.62k | £537.60k | £478.38k | £1.35m | |
|
Other assets | £316.35k | £516.21k | £352.84k | £1.24m | £288.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £454.90k | £361.45k | £276.99k | £263.44k | £103.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/08/2014 AS AMENDED ON 08 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEPT 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL NATIONS, BUT ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS, BY ENCOURAGING IN THEM A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND AN APPRECIATION OF THE CULTURAL VALUES OF TOWNS AND CITIES IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD, AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO TO PROVIDE YOUTH HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION IN WHICH THERE SHALL BE NO DISTINCTIONS OF ORIGINS, NATIONALITY, COLOUR, RELIGION, SEX, CLASS OR POLITICAL OPINIONS, AND THEREBY TO DEVELOP A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER PEOPLE, BOTH AT HOME AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International Youth Hostel
Federation
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- +44 7545 641612
- Email:
- info@hihostels.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window