Financial history FRIENDS OF GREENWICH PENINSULA ECOLOGY PARK

Charity number: 1119415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.80k £10.88k £4.03k £6.93k £4.69k
Total expenditure £3.71k £9.54k £7.71k £2.16k £6.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A