AWAITING EYES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention of relief of poverty for the benefit of poor and orphan children by providing food, education and clothing. Advancement of Education for the benefit of Local and European students including the unemployed, disabled and the socially disadvantaged by providing work placement/internship, advice and general work experience help. New project for 2012-2013 : 110 rooms hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 12 December 2006: Standard registration
- 13 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.40k | £75.43k | £53.27k | £61.95k | £57.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.02k | £69.60k | £53.32k | £67.37k | £56.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2016
(These accounts |
30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 05 March 2016 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | 03 February 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
(1) FAMINE RELIEF FOR THE EARTHQUAKE VICTIMS OF PAKISTAN. (2) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND WOMEN FOLK IN THE EARTHQUAKE EFFECTED AREAS OF PAKISTAN. (3) TO ESTABLISH AND RUN AN ORPHANAGE CENTRE FOR THE ORPHANED CHILDREN OF THE EARTHQUAKE IN PAKISTAN
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window