Trustees LEIGHTON LINSLADE AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1117337

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leonard Ryder | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Linda Joan Dingley | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Nash | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Olliffe | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karina Burrowes | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Douglas James Leonard | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Milne | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Humphreys Williams | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cherie Hall | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Barbara Stuart | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Tara Willmott | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.