DEANES ASSOCIATION FUNDRAISING FOR STUDENTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds by donations and sales at events,raffles and events such as Castle Point Show. We also raise money online through various point system collections. Faculties within the school request funding for extra resources and the PTA provides funding for extra curricular activities and support to students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 19 December 2006: Standard registration
- 29 January 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRODO (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE DEANES ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.01k | £1.57k | £672 | £85 | £381 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £845 | £447 | £128 | £377 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 September 2022 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THUNDERSLEY BENFLEET, ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window