FURNISTORE IN EAST SURREY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collects and distributes pre-owned furniture and appliances to low income households setting up home, or sells them on at affordable prices to raise funds. Thereby reduces volume of bulky waste going to landfill; also supports volunteers, including those wanting to get back to work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,240 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 January 2007: Standard registration
- 09 November 2018: Funds received from 1058601 CRAWLEY FURNI-AID
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ED BAKER | Chair |
|
||||||
Clare Smailes | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Daniel Taylor | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Philip Jones | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Gareth Owen | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ST AUBIN ESSEX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDA CLARK BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.95k | £121.41k | £104.85k | £157.55k | £180.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.33k | £93.69k | £97.71k | £105.15k | £125.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k | £47.49k | £14.97k | N/A | £1.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 JANUARY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN EAST SURREY BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF GOOD QUALITY PRE-OWNED AND OTHER FURNITURE, APPLIANCES AND HOUSEHOLD GOODS AT AFFORDABLE PRICES TO LOW INCOME FAMILIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION BY MEANS OF REDUCING THE VOLUME OF FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD GOODS DISPOSED OF INTO THE WASTE STREAM AND; THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT, BY PROVIDING WORKPLACE EXPERIENCE, TRAINING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
EAST SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 HOLMETHORPE AVENUE
REDHILL
RH1 2NL
- Phone:
- 01737773133
- Email:
- contactus@furnistore.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window