Financial history LISTENING EAR (MERSEYSIDE)

Charity number: 1117324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £801.57k £1.01m £1.50m £2.22m £2.66m
Total expenditure £790.23k £881.46k £1.24m £1.97m £2.77m
Income from government contracts £707.32k £702.48k £963.16k £1.80m £1.81m
Income from government grants N/A £26.00k £79.91k £75.75k £110.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.10k £12.31k £12.58k £13.90k £13.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £215
Income - Charitable activities £780.64k £983.52k £1.47m £2.19m £2.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £332 £113 £68 £2.27k £9.90k
Income - Other £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k £9.88k £9.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £790.23k £881.46k £1.24m £1.97m £2.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £164.42k £8.01k £11.57k £381.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0