Financial history ONGO HOMES LIMITED

Charity number: 1117952
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £34.39k £36.34k £39.81m £42.87m £47.14m
Total expenditure £36.05k £28.22k £33.21m £32.75m £35.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £518.00k £446.89k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.14m £1.68m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £39.81m £41.87m £46.43m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £28.00k £605.81k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £978.00k £97.30k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £33.14m £32.72m £35.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £64.93k £35.15k £68.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £380.61k £0 £585.48k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0