ONGO HOMES LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING NEEDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income:
£47,137,360
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £46.43m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £605.81k | |
Other | £97.30k |
Total expenditure:
£35,683,573
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £35.68m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £446,887 from government contract(s) and £1,677,547 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £35.68m | |
Retained for future use | £11.45m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 February 2007: Standard registration
- 09 October 2017: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
- NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE HOMES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.39k | £36.34k | £39.81m | £42.87m | £47.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.05k | £28.22k | £33.21m | £32.75m | £35.68m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £518.00k | £446.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.14m | £1.68m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £39.81m | £41.87m | £46.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £28.00k | £605.81k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £978.00k | £97.30k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £33.14m | £32.72m | £35.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £64.93k | £35.15k | £68.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £380.61k | £0 | £585.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £103.00m | £108.31m | £157.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £7.16m | £10.56m | £21.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | -£6.59m | -£13.17m | -£2.90m | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £76.09m | £75.23m | £118.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
12 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
09 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/07/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/01/2016
Charitable objects
5. THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE: 5.1 TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 5.2 TO PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF SOCIAL HOUSING, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 5.3 TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 5.4 TO PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS; 5.5 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS; 5.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 5.7 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 5.7.1 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP; (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES, 5.7.2 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS, 5.7.3 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, 5.7.4 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE, 5.7.5 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, 5.7.6 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE, 5.7.7 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME, 5.7.8 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES, 5.8 PROMOTE PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENT CRIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window