POET IN THE CITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is to: 1) Transform the live poetry sector through inspiring events; 2) Make live poetry accessible to people of all ages and backgrounds; 3) Deliver live poetry across the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £68,313 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahrukh Bhatty | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lucy Dundas | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Cole | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lenore Goodings | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|||||
MARY-ALICE STACK | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.15k | £335.15k | £489.95k | £233.71k | £277.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.06k | £176.29k | £475.35k | £351.94k | £324.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.22k | £177.92k | £5.71k | £89.70k | £68.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 8 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF POETRY, AND THE USE OF POETRY IN PROMOTING PUBLIC ENGAGEMENT AND CULTURAL DIVERSITY IN THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Rawstorne Place
LONDON
EC1V 7NL
- Phone:
- 0207 014 2812
- Email:
- info@poetinthecity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window