Without Walls

Charity number: 1119209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports the aims of Without Walls Christian Fellowship, a church with a vision based on Zechariah Chapter 2 and verses 4-5..a city without walls. Proclamation of Christian gospel, teaching of Christian doctrine, pastoral care and relief of hardship in the community. There are church meetings each week. The church reaches the community through it's Singing Cafe and Tea party projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £100,799
Total expenditure: £128,530

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WITHOUT WALLS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILES FREDERICK HOLLAND PARKER Chair 12 December 2019
HELP INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Restorers 58
Received: On time
Charles Anthony Borlace Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Jane Lovell Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record
Richard John Stanley Trustee 03 July 2010
CONCORDIA CHOIR (ASHBY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.63k £51.48k £68.38k £129.13k £100.80k
Total expenditure £62.81k £49.79k £67.02k £115.42k £128.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.03k £5.75k £7.50k £30.50k £24.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
135 Main Street
Stanton under Bardon
MARKFIELD
LE67 9TQ
Phone:
07966231611
Website:

No information available