GRACE CHURCH WANSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of Grace Church Wanstead is the advancement of the Christian faith and its principal activities are Church services each Sunday, other mid-week Christian meetings, Partnership with other Christians in the UK and overseas, and proclaiming the Gospel in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 07 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Keith Ferdinando | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Costas Argyrou | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Gibbs | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.99k | £57.73k | £70.92k | £59.95k | £74.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.97k | £67.11k | £58.23k | £71.80k | £65.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 31 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
3.1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM BY THE FAITHFUL AND PRAYERFUL TEACHING OF THE SCRIPTURES AT GRACE CHURCH WANSTEAD AND BY THE RECRUITMENT EDUCATION TRAINING AND SENDING OF GOSPEL MINISTERS AND OTHERS AROUND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD TO ESTABLISH AND RENEW CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND MINISTRIES RELATED THERETO 3.2) THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS AMONG ANY PERSONS WITHOUT LIMITATION 3.3) THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE PERSECUTED BY REASON OF THEIR FAITH PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL IN NATURE 3.4) THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE ENGAGED FULL-TIME IN THE MISSIONARY WORK OF PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND IN BRINGING OTHERS TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIS TEACHING "THE CHRISTIAN FAITH" IS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 12.1 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE REDBRIDGE, WALTHAM FOREST, WANSTEAD, ALDERSBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 19 Highstone Avenue
LONDON
E11 2PP
- Phone:
- 020 8989 6092
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window