KAIROS INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church services and community charity work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 19 December 2006: Standard registration
- KAIROS COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOKHESYA PHIRI | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev PATRICK ZIMBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELLEN KUNONGA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £1.20k | £1.90k | £0 | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £1.20k | £1.89k | £0 | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; AND (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS AND WHO MAY BE AGED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Echad Services
26 Wych Elm
HARLOW
CM20 1QR
- Phone:
- 07958725402
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.