ST HILDA'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education and residential accommodation for women and men who are members of the College and the University of Oxford. To maintain, continue and develop the College ethos and tradition of providing encouragement and support in academic research and education undertaken by women and men. To do all other such things as are incidental or conducive to support the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£12,119,000
Donations and legacies | £2.32m | |
Charitable activities | £7.34m | |
Other trading activities | £798.00k | |
Investments | £1.66m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,349,000
Raising funds | £692.00k | |
Charitable activities | £11.24m | |
Other | £417.00k |
£1,496,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.11m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.24m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.11m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.24m | |
Retained for future use | £1.27m |
People

144 Employee(s)
42 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 August 2010: Standard registration
- ST HILDA'S COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Charlotte Stagg | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Robin Thompson | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Hoban | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Naomi Wray | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malachi McIntosh | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Sarah Marcella Springman DBE | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Wood | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Hanson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Ruth Schenk | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Tew | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrea Mondino | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Duncan Richards | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Parrott | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Havelkova | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Claire Gwenlan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anders Bredahl Kock | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Sarah Jane Norman | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Lorraine Wild | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Barlow | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Daniel Peter Bulte | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Elizabeth Swales | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dev Saif Gangjee | Trustee | 14 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr PHILIPPA ANNE HULLEY | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELINOR PAYNE | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julia Alison Noble | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor Rachel Condry | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DANIEL LESLIE WAKELIN | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ARIS KATZOURAKIS | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor HELEN JANE SWIFT | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor DAVID ALASTAIR HOWEY | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor SELINA TODD | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN BENEDICT MCHUGH | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor PETRA SCHLEITER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Dmitry Filatov | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr REBECCA MARGARET ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Katherine Jane Clarke | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEORGINA LOUISE BRENTNALL PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor Lorna Joyce Smith | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr KERSTIN HOGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HANNAH ELIZABETH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARGARET KEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.74m | £10.94m | £9.98m | £10.53m | £12.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.60m | £8.51m | £9.28m | £13.81m | £12.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.97m | £3.29m | £2.85m | £2.38m | £2.32m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £210.00k | £104.00k | £71.00k | £497.00k | £798.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.79m | £4.91m | £5.05m | £497.00k | £7.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £5.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | £1.62m | £8.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.77m | £2.43m | £1.75m | £1.59m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Other | £4.00k | £209.00k | £269.00k | £6.04m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £474.00k | £2.12m | £956.00k | £0 | £234.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.71m | £7.74m | £8.61m | £12.89m | £11.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £744.00k | £703.00k | £642.00k | £678.00k | £692.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.00k | £18.00k | £0 | £22.00k | £26.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £8.61m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £275.00k | £266.00k | £241.00k | £234.00k | £181.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £141.00k | £74.00k | £33.00k | £235.00k | £417.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £61.15m | £136.83m | £141.25m | £135.92m | £116.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £73.80m | £1.01m | £1.01m | £1.66m | £23.01m | |
|
Other assets | £5.80m | £4.87m | £7.48m | £8.57m | £7.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.98m | -£1.49m | -£1.35m | -£3.20m | -£2.15m | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.00m | £21.57m | £21.58m | £21.51m | £21.96m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTERS OF 13 MARCH 1926, 29 AUGUST 1955, 20 FEBRUARY 1961 AND 25 JULY 2007 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 25 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN AND MEN WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE AND OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD. 2. TO MAINTAIN, CONTINUE AND DEVELOP THE COLLEGE ETHOS AND TRADITION OF PROVIDING ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT IN ACADEMIC RESEARCH AND EDUCATION UNDERTAKEN BY WOMEN AND MEN.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
COWLEY PLACE
OXFORD
OX4 1DY
- Phone:
- 01865276815
- Email:
- PRINCIPAL@ST-HILDAS.OX.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window