WAKEFIELD TRINITY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wakefield Trinity Community Trust aims to use the power of sport and other physical activities to engage with young people, especially, though not exclusively, those who are disadvantaged or deprived and feed them towards more healthy fulfilling and positive lifestyles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £223,175 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Kirklees
- Lincolnshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 04 May 2007: Standard registration
- WAKEFIELD WILDCATS COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE TEAL | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eric Timmins | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Castle | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £573.83k | £606.51k | £532.41k | £478.18k | £448.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £468.23k | £647.68k | £511.00k | £486.26k | £458.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £86.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £38.90k | £223.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £193.18k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £368.63k | £599.30k | £524.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £12.02k | £7.21k | £8.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £429.19k | £647.68k | £511.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.04k | £1.32k | £845 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £39.04k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wakefield Trinity Rugby League FC
Doncaster Road
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF1 5EY
- Phone:
- 01924211611
- Email:
- dt@wakefieldtrinity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window