AUCKLAND YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Auckland Youth and Community Centre is an active, vibrant and diverse community hub in the heart of Woodhouse Close, one of England's most disadvantaged housing estates. We are situated one mile from Bishop Auckland town centre. Our Centre, which opened in 1964, supports local people of all ages and needs with a wide range of activities, interventions, learning experiences and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £126,675 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 28 February 2007: Standard registration
- 19 December 2013: Funds received from 520728 AUCKLAND CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM WALLACE NIBLO | Chair | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Watson | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jolanta Zofia Drygas | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NADINE KIPLING | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.25k | £459.78k | £413.46k | £507.70k | £429.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.71k | £371.32k | £418.32k | £433.97k | £461.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.44k | £59.55k | £36.19k | £90.87k | £126.68k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £433.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE BUILDING IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY; B) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BISHOP AUCKLAND, PRIMARILY RESIDENTS OF WOODHOUSE CLOSE ESTATE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COMMUNITY") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
WOODHOUSE CLOSE ESTATE, BISHOP AUCKLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Auckland Youth and Community Centre
Walker Drive
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 6QL
- Phone:
- 01388604575
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window