WINCANTON SILVER BAND

Charity number: 1118079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDING MUSICAL ENTERTAINMENT THROUGH PLAYING AT CHARITY EVENTS I.E.FETES,CONCERTS; COMPETING AT REGIONAL & NATIONAL BRASS BAND COMPETITIONS; AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS TO LEARN A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT OR IMPROVE THEIR MUSICIANSHIP

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,339
Total expenditure: £3,477

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Somerset
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID SHAVE Trustee 21 June 2011
None on record
MIRIAM ROSE PARSONS Trustee
None on record
DAVID JAMES PARSONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.89k £10.42k £3.72k £5.87k £5.34k
Total expenditure £4.39k £3.51k £3.55k £3.58k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 November 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hopkins Court
Bennetts Field Industrial Estate
Wincanton
Somerset
BA9 9DT
Phone:
01963 33072