PROSTATE CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117399
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Prostate Cancer Research Foundation has two aims, the first to promote independent worldwide research into all aspects of prostate cancer; and the second to spread the crucial knowledge gathered from that research as far afield as possible, via internationally recognised Forum, attended by the world's top prostate cancer experts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2009

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Canada
  • Israel
  • Netherlands
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 2006: Standard registration
  • 30 December 2010: Removed
  • 30 December 2010: Funds transferred to 1135297-1 PROSTATE CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PROSTATE RESEARCH (Working name)
  • PROSTATE CANCER CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
  • PROSTATE CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION 2006 (Previous name)
  • THE PROSTATE CANCER RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £524.40k £1.21m £833.12k
Total expenditure £230.97k £847.64k £900.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £515.29k £544.52k £376.13k
Income - Other trading activities £8.73k £636.42k £442.03k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £373 £24.20k £14.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £149.48k £561.96k £592.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.05k £52.47k £61.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Own use assets £6.83k £12.00k £11.10k
Long-term investments £0 £656 £581
Other assets £360.60k £694.10k £572.20k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £73.99k £55.83k £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 25 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 25 February 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2007 22 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 22 April 2008 On Time