Accounts and annual returns SUCCESS IN YOUR BUSINESS.COM

Charity number: 1120036
Charity reporting is overdue by 581 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 581 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 581 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 10 November 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 27 October 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 27 October 2021 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required