RIANA DEVELOPMENT NETWORK (RDN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riana Development Network is a community based organisation, organised to promote health, socio-economic and cultural development amongst the resident African communities living in the UK. Riana is established to further such charitable purposes for the benefit of the public (in particular, members from the minority ethnic communities, women and children either nationally or overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £26,455 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 June 2007: Standard registration
- RIANA DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION NETWORK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erick Ogello | Chair | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shem Obuya | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victor Ojwang | Trustee | 30 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tei Adegu | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Osore Mr | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELLEN ODIEMBO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.75k | £178.54k | £168.59k | £164.27k | £186.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.82k | £176.35k | £167.67k | £175.73k | £172.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.43k | £54.38k | £62.49k | £34.20k | £26.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 27 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/2015 as amended on 29 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF AFRICAN PEOPLE FROM THE GREAT LAKES REGION OF AFRICA, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE AND WOMEN WHO RESIDE IN THE UK AND AFRICA BY: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT: B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE; C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON HEALTH ISSUES SUCH AS HIV/AIDS; AND D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISSUES FACED BY AFRICAN PEOPLE FROM THE GREAT LAKES REGION OF AFRICA BOTH IN THE UK AND AFRICA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY ROOM
1 EDENSOR GARDENS
CHISWICK
LONDON
W4 2QY
- Phone:
- 02087428906
- Email:
- info@riana.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window