Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD YOGA FOR ME/CFS

Charity number: 1117464
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 February 2025 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required