Financial history SHEFFIELD YOGA FOR ME/CFS

Charity number: 1117464
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.24k £10.35k £4.30k £15.21k £12.08k
Total expenditure £12.71k £2.33k £4.89k £10.12k £12.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A