Accounts and annual returns SHERFIELD PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1120303
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 September 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 September 2021 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 01 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 01 July 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late