Financial history LEEDS LUTHERAN CHURCH HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1117471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £23.11k £19.70k £20.85k £24.32k £28.97k
Total expenditure £22.55k £17.83k £21.48k £21.42k £25.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A