Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL DISABLED POLICE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119910
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 15 March 2010 43 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 February 2009 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 March 2009 58 days late