ASLOCKTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision for young people Communication-Newsletter(Aslockton Voice), Website,Welcome Pack Improving the local environment Lobbying for better transport Safety,promote neighbourhood watch schemes, traffic speeding check Assisting with fund raising Social,plays,concerts,Events. Improving community spirit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 June 2007: Standard registration
- 18 December 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £977 | £1.80k | £1.30k | £813 | £284 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.11k | £940 | £443 | £2.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 24 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 23 APRIL 2007 AND 30 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ASLOCKTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
ASLOCKTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window